NE LB118 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Approved by Governor on February 26, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Approved by Governor on February 26, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt licensed cigar shops and tobacco retail outlets from smoking restrictions
Title
Exempt licensed cigar shops and tobacco retail outlets from smoking restrictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-3-1 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 26, 2015 |
2015-02-23 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 20, 2015 |
2015-02-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-02-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-3-1 |
2015-02-20 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-02-17 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST3 |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Schumacher AM343 adopted |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Larson AM76 withdrawn |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER14 adopted |
2015-02-11 | Legislature | Schumacher AM343 filed |
2015-02-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER14 filed |
2015-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER14 |
2015-02-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-02-04 | Legislature | Larson AM221 adopted |
2015-02-04 | Legislature | Larson AM221 filed |
2015-02-04 | Legislature | Larson AM98 withdrawn |
2015-02-04 | Legislature | Larson AM77 withdrawn |
2015-02-04 | Legislature | General Affairs AM97 adopted |
2015-01-29 | Legislature | Bloomfield name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Kintner name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | General Affairs AM97 filed |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM97 |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Larson AM98 filed |
2015-01-27 | Legislature | Larson AM76 filed |
2015-01-27 | Legislature | Larson AM77 filed |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Krist name withdrawn |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2015 |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Coash name added |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2015-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |