NE LB1176 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1176 amended into LB800 by AM2352
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1176 amended into LB800 by AM2352
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the Affordable Housing Tax Credit Act
Title
Change the Affordable Housing Tax Credit Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1176 amended into LB800 by AM2352 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-17 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2022 |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |