NE LB1176 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the sale of tobacco products, electronic nicotine delivery systems, and alternative nicotine products
Title
Change provisions relating to the sale of tobacco products, electronic nicotine delivery systems, and alternative nicotine products
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2020 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41559 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1176.pdf |