NE LB1174 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to section lines and vacation or abandonment of public roads

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to section lines and vacation or abandonment of public roads

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2024-02-20LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2506 filed
2024-02-20LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2506
2024-02-02LegislatureHansen AM2266 filed
2024-01-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 02, 2024
2024-01-16LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2024-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback