NE LB1172 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to juveniles and provide duties for the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
Change provisions relating to juveniles and provide duties for the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2020 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41325 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1172.pdf |