NE LB1167 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require members of the public to be allowed to speak at each meeting subject to the Open Meetings Act
Title
Require members of the public to be allowed to speak at each meeting subject to the Open Meetings Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for July 27, 2020 on AM3104 (cancel) |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Brewer AM3104 filed |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for July 27, 2020 on AM3104 |
2020-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 20, 2020 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41478 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1167.pdf |