NE LB1166 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 07, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 07, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change school district membership requirements as prescribed
Title
Change school district membership requirements as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Education AM2310 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Education AM2310 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 07, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 03, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2020-07-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER203 adopted |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER203 filed |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER203 |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Education AM2310 adopted |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Education AM2310 filed |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2310 |
2020-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2020 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |