NE LB1162 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Approved by Governor on April 2, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to fees and mileage for sheriffs and constables

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to fees and mileage for sheriffs and constables

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-28 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Legislature - Lowe AM2946 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2500 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-02LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 2, 2024
2024-03-28LegislaturePresented to Governor on March 28, 2024
2024-03-28LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2024-03-28LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 44-0-5
2024-03-19LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2024-03-14LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2024-03-14LegislatureLowe AM2946 adopted
2024-03-14LegislatureLowe AM2946 to ER78 filed
2024-03-14LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER78 adopted
2024-03-07LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER78 filed
2024-03-07LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER78
2024-03-04LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2024-03-04LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2500 adopted
2024-02-20LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2500 filed
2024-02-20LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2500
2024-01-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 02, 2024
2024-01-16LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2024-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=55227
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LB1162.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Final/LB1162.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Slip/LB1162.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM2946.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/ER78.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM2500.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/SI/LB1162.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB1162_20240201-122109.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/CS/LB1162.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10175
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10176
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10329
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10601

Bill Comments

feedback