NE LB1160 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 10, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Nebraska Statewide Workforce and Education Reporting System Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Nebraska Statewide Workforce and Education Reporting System Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 33-5-11 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Legislature - Business and Labor AM3084 adopted (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-11LegislatureApproved by Governor on August 10, 2020
2020-08-05LegislaturePresented to Governor on August 04, 2020
2020-08-04LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2020-08-04LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 33-5-11
2020-07-31LegislatureVargas name added
2020-07-31LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2020-07-30LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-07-30LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER225 adopted
2020-07-27LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER225 filed
2020-07-27LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER225
2020-07-22LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-07-22LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM3084 adopted
2020-07-21LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM3084 filed
2020-07-21LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM3084
2020-02-21LegislatureBusiness and Labor priority bill
2020-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 10, 2020
2020-01-24LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2020-01-22LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback