NE LB1158 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 10, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change contract provisions and provide duties regarding job-skills programs under the Medical Assistance Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change contract provisions and provide duties regarding job-skills programs under the Medical Assistance Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Legislature - Arch AM3174 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Legislature - Arch AM2980 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM2851 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-11LegislatureApproved by Governor on August 10, 2020
2020-08-05LegislaturePresented to Governor on August 04, 2020
2020-08-04LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2020-08-04LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2
2020-07-31LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2020-07-30LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-07-30LegislatureWayne MO204 withdrawn
2020-07-30LegislatureWayne MO204 Recommit to the Health and Human Services Committee filed
2020-07-30LegislatureArch AM3174 adopted
2020-07-30LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER228 adopted
2020-07-27LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER228 filed
2020-07-27LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER228
2020-07-27LegislatureArch AM3174 filed
2020-07-23LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-07-23LegislatureArch AM2980 adopted
2020-07-23LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM2851 adopted
2020-07-20LegislatureArch AM2980 filed
2020-03-12LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM2851 filed
2020-03-12LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2851
2020-02-20LegislatureArch priority bill
2020-02-12LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 19, 2020
2020-01-24LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-22LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback