NE LB1157 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for counting Nebraska residents in Nebraska prisons for redistricting purposes
Title
Provide for counting Nebraska residents in Nebraska prisons for redistricting purposes
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41560 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1157.pdf |