NE LB1150 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1150 amended into LB1188 by AM2769
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1150 amended into LB1188 by AM2769
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require the youth rehabilitation and treatment centers to be fully operational by July 1, 2021
Title
Require the youth rehabilitation and treatment centers to be fully operational by July 1, 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brandt [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1150 amended into LB1188 by AM2769 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-03-05 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2742 filed |
2020-03-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2742 |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41543 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1150.pdf |