NE LB115 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Impose sales tax on candy and soft drinks and provide for distribution of proceeds
Title
Impose sales tax on candy and soft drinks and provide for distribution of proceeds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |