NE LB1148 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the Nebraska Motor Vehicle Industry Licensing Board to employ a hearing officer
Title
Provide for the Nebraska Motor Vehicle Industry Licensing Board to employ a hearing officer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Hunt MO235 withdrawn |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Hunt MO235 Recommit to Committee filed |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA90 withdrawn |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER114 adopted |
2022-03-10 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA90 filed |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER114 filed |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER114 |
2022-02-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-02-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2022 |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |