NE LB1148 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Enrollment and Review ER215 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide and change requirements for reports of abuse and neglect and placement and treatment of juveniles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide and change requirements for reports of abuse and neglect and placement and treatment of juveniles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Legislature - Lathrop AM2810 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Legislature - Lathrop AM2666 adopted (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Legislature - Judiciary AM2637 adopted (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER215 filed
2020-03-23LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER215
2020-03-10LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-03-10LegislatureLathrop AM2810 adopted
2020-03-10LegislatureLathrop AM2666 adopted
2020-03-10LegislatureJudiciary AM2637 adopted
2020-03-09LegislatureLathrop AM2810 filed
2020-03-03LegislatureLathrop AM2666 filed
2020-02-27LegislatureJudiciary AM2637 filed
2020-02-27LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2637
2020-02-21LegislatureHilkemann priority bill
2020-01-30LegislatureBolz name withdrawn
2020-01-28LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 06, 2020
2020-01-24LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2020-01-23LegislatureBolz name added
2020-01-22LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback