NE LB1141 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1141 amended into LB1140 by AM2663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1141 amended into LB1140 by AM2663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require the Department of Health and Human Services to develop operations plans for the youth rehabilitation and treatment centers
Title
Require the Department of Health and Human Services to develop operations plans for the youth rehabilitation and treatment centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1141 amended into LB1140 by AM2663 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41237 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1141.pdf |