NE LB1137 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Rename and change provisions of the Nebraska Fair Pay to Play Act
Title
Rename and change provisions of the Nebraska Fair Pay to Play Act
Sponsors
Sen. Megan Hunt [N] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 34-8-7 (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 34-8-7 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER146 adopted |
2022-03-17 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER146 filed |
2022-03-17 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER146 |
2022-03-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-03-14 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA109 withdrawn |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA109 filed |
2022-02-17 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2022-02-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2022 |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |