NE LB1133 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Industrial Hemp Act, provide an exemption under the Uniform Controlled Substances Act, and eliminate a provision relating to industrial hemp research
Title
Adopt the Industrial Hemp Act, provide an exemption under the Uniform Controlled Substances Act, and eliminate a provision relating to industrial hemp research
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-07 | Legislature | Krist name added |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Ebke name added |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2018 |
2018-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34794 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1133.pdf |