NE LB1132 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB897 amended into LB1132 by AM2361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Require certain reporting by health care providers of injury from sexual assault, provide a procedure to set aside convictions of victims of sex trafficking and to expunge records, and provide for development and distribution of a statewide model anonymous reporting protocol

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require certain reporting by health care providers of injury from sexual assault, provide a procedure to set aside convictions of victims of sex trafficking and to expunge records, and provide for development and distribution of a statewide model anonymous reporting protocol

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB897 amended into LB1132 by AM2361
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB855 amended into LB1132 by AM2361
2018-04-18LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 17, 2018
2018-04-11LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 11, 2018
2018-04-11LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-04-11LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 45-0-4
2018-04-11LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2018-04-03LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST57
2018-03-28LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-03-28LegislatureThibodeau AM2718 withdrawn
2018-03-28LegislatureMotion to overrule the Chair withdrawn
2018-03-28LegislatureChair ruled Thibodeau AM2718 not germane to bill
2018-03-28LegislatureThibodeau AM2718 filed
2018-03-28LegislaturePansing Brooks AM2707 adopted
2018-03-28LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER139 adopted
2018-03-27LegislaturePansing Brooks AM2707 filed
2018-03-23LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER139 filed
2018-03-23LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER139
2018-03-21LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-03-21LegislatureLindstrom AM2361 adopted
2018-03-21LegislatureLindstrom AM2159 withdrawn
2018-03-21LegislatureJudiciary AM1971 adopted
2018-03-20LegislatureMcCollister name added
2018-03-14LegislatureLindstrom AM2361 filed
2018-03-08LegislatureQuick name added
2018-03-06LegislatureLindstrom AM2159 filed
2018-02-26LegislatureJudiciary AM1971 filed
2018-02-26LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1971
2018-02-20LegislatureQuick priority bill
2018-01-25LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 09, 2018
2018-01-22LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2018-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback