NE LB1131 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent to appropriate federal funds for bonus payments for teachers, child care workers, and health care workers
Title
State intent to appropriate federal funds for bonus payments for teachers, child care workers, and health care workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Gragert name added |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |