NE LB1130A | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Legislature - Morfeld MO232 prevailed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Morfeld MO232 prevailed |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Morfeld MO232 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2022-04-08 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2022-04-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |