NE LB113 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Approved by Governor on March 29, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change population threshold provisions relating to municipalities and eliminate obsolete provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change population threshold provisions relating to municipalities and eliminate obsolete provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29LegislatureApproved by Governor on March 29, 2017
2017-03-23LegislaturePresented to Governor on March 23, 2017
2017-03-23LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-03-23LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 48-0-1
2017-03-23LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2017-03-20LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-03-15LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-03-15LegislatureHansen AM362 adopted
2017-03-15LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER5 adopted
2017-02-24LegislatureHansen AM362 filed
2017-02-23LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER5 filed
2017-02-23LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER5
2017-02-16LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-02-16LegislatureUrban Affairs AM5 adopted
2017-01-19LegislatureUrban Affairs AM5 filed
2017-01-19LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM5
2017-01-10LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 17, 2017
2017-01-10LegislatureReferred to Urban Affairs Committee
2017-01-06LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback