NE LB1127 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change and provide contempt powers for the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Court
Title
Change and provide contempt powers for the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Court
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41548 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1127.pdf |