NE LB1121A | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-2-6 (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Communication |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Returned by Governor without approval on April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-2-6 |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-02-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-02-27 | Legislature | Date of introduction |