NE LB1120 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1120 amended into LB1055 by AM2573
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1120 amended into LB1055 by AM2573
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restrict special elections under the Election Act as prescribed
Title
Restrict special elections under the Election Act as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1120 amended into LB1055 by AM2573 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41591 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1120.pdf |