NE LB1120 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB747 amended into LB1120 by AM2784
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB747 amended into LB1120 by AM2784
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Nebraska Liquor Control Act and music licensing provisions
Title
Change provisions of the Nebraska Liquor Control Act and music licensing provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB747 amended into LB1120 by AM2784 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Larson AM2127 withdrawn |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST66 |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Thibodeau AM2835 adopted |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Larson AM2126 withdrawn |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER172 adopted |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Thibodeau name added |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Thibodeau AM2835 filed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER172 filed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER172 |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Thibodeau AM2784 adopted |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Thibodeau AM2784 filed |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | General Affairs AM2545 adopted |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | General Affairs AM2545 filed |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2545 |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Larson AM2127 filed |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Larson AM2126 filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | General Affairs priority bill |
2018-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2018 |
2018-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |