NE LB1117 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Notice of hearing for February 13, 2020
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change sentencing provisions for crimes committed by a person under twenty-one years of age and change provisions relating to jurisdiction over juveniles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change sentencing provisions for crimes committed by a person under twenty-one years of age and change provisions relating to jurisdiction over juveniles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-28LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 13, 2020
2020-01-24LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2020-01-22LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback