NE LB1115 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require the development of certain property in order for the property to retain its property tax exemption
Title
Require the development of certain property in order for the property to retain its property tax exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 02, 2022 |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |