NE LB1113 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1113 amended into LB1023 by AM3034
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to the types of property receiving a property tax exemption under the ImagiNE Nebraska Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to the types of property receiving a property tax exemption under the ImagiNE Nebraska Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-25LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB1113 amended into LB1023 by AM3034
2024-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2024-02-28LegislatureRevenue AM2122 filed
2024-02-28LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2122
2024-01-24LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 31, 2024
2024-01-11LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2024-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback