NE LB1112 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Computer Science and Technology Education Act and provide and change graduation requirements and academic content standards
Title
Adopt the Computer Science and Technology Education Act and provide and change graduation requirements and academic content standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 33-11-5 (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Education AM1942 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - McKinney AM2101 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Education AM1942 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - McKinney AM2101 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 33-11-5 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Hughes AM2836 not considered |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Motion to return to return to Select File withdrawn |
2022-04-11 | Legislature | Hughes AM2836 filed |
2022-03-30 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2022-03-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER135 adopted |
2022-03-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER135 filed |
2022-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER135 |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Education AM1942 adopted |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | McKinney AM2101 adopted |
2022-03-03 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | McKinney AM2101 filed |
2022-02-23 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2022-02-22 | Legislature | Education AM1942 filed |
2022-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1942 |
2022-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2022 |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |