NE LB1108 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize certain tax credits, change the sales tax rate, and provide for school foundation aid and certain grant programs
Title
Authorize certain tax credits, change the sales tax rate, and provide for school foundation aid and certain grant programs
Sponsors
Sen. Burke Harr [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Harr priority bill |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2018 |
2018-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34691 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1108.pdf |