NE LB1105 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Name the Branded Certificate of Title Act and provide for the issuance of destroyed-vehicle branded certificates of title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Name the Branded Certificate of Title Act and provide for the issuance of destroyed-vehicle branded certificates of title

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2024-02-23LegislatureDeKay AM2660 filed
2024-01-25LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 27, 2024
2024-01-11LegislatureReferred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
2024-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback