NE LB1101 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the schedule of compensation for certain injuries resulting in disability under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act
Title
Change the schedule of compensation for certain injuries resulting in disability under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41494 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1101.pdf |