NE LB110 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB110 amended into LB415 by AM923
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB110 amended into LB415 by AM923
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change duties and requirements relating to certain retirement plan reporting and change duties of the Auditor of Public Accounts and the Public Employees Retirement Board
Title
Change duties and requirements relating to certain retirement plan reporting and change duties of the Auditor of Public Accounts and the Public Employees Retirement Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB110 amended into LB415 by AM923 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2017-02-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2017 |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2017-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31218 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB110.pdf |