NE LB1093 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Enhancement Project Financing Assistance Act and provide for the use of certain sales tax revenue
Title
Adopt the Enhancement Project Financing Assistance Act and provide for the use of certain sales tax revenue
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Flood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2022 |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Gragert name added |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |