NE LB1090 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds to the Department of Administrative Services for the Nebraska Public Safety Communication System
Title
Appropriate funds to the Department of Administrative Services for the Nebraska Public Safety Communication System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2024 |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |