NE LB1090 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to income tax brackets, personal exemptions, standard deductions, and itemized deductions
Title
Change provisions relating to income tax brackets, personal exemptions, standard deductions, and itemized deductions
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Krist AM2754 withdrawn |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Krist FA121 withdrawn |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Smith AM1705 withdrawn |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Krist AM2754 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Krist FA121 filed |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Smith AM1703 withdrawn |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER125 adopted |
2018-03-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER125 filed |
2018-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER125 |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Chambers MO250 withdrawn |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Chambers MO250 pending |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Chambers MO250 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Chambers MO251 failed |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Chambers MO251 Reconsider the vote on AM2255 filed |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Krist AM2255 lost |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Krist AM2255 filed |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Smith AM1704 withdrawn |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Smith AM1705 filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Smith AM1703 filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Smith AM1704 filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Revenue priority bill |
2018-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2018 |
2018-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |