NE LB109 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Bolz AM1854 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require the position classification plan and salary or pay plan for state employees to include certain positions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require the position classification plan and salary or pay plan for state employees to include certain positions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16LegislatureBolz AM1854 filed
2019-05-13LegislaturePlaced on General File
2019-03-19LegislatureBolz priority bill
2019-02-04LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 14, 2019
2019-01-14LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2019-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback