NE LB1084 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1084 amended into LB1107 by AM3316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1084 amended into LB1107 by AM3316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Nebraska Transformational Projects Act
Title
Adopt the Nebraska Transformational Projects Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1084 amended into LB1107 by AM3316 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Groene name withdrawn |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | Kolterman AM2211 filed |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Kolowski name added |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Crawford name added |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Lowe name added |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41558 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1084.pdf |