NE LB1083 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1083 amended into LB1042 by AM2592
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1083 amended into LB1042 by AM2592
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Meadowlark Program
Title
Change provisions relating to the Meadowlark Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1083 amended into LB1042 by AM2592 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-19 | Legislature | Education AM2454 filed |
2020-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2454 |
2020-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41346 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1083.pdf |