NE LB1082 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Require the Game and Parks Commission to provide certain organ and tissue donation information on applications for certain hunting and fishing permits
Title
Require the Game and Parks Commission to provide certain organ and tissue donation information on applications for certain hunting and fishing permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-1-3 (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Legislature - Gragert AM1991 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Legislature - Gragert AM1991 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-1-3 |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST65 |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER147 adopted |
2022-03-17 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER147 filed |
2022-03-17 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER147 |
2022-03-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-03-14 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA108 withdrawn |
2022-03-14 | Legislature | Gragert AM1991 adopted |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. FA108 filed |
2022-03-03 | Legislature | Gragert AM1991 filed |
2022-02-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2022 |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |