NE LB1080 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 07, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Require school policies that prohibit sexual conduct with students and former students

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require school policies that prohibit sexual conduct with students and former students

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-11LegislatureApproved by Governor on August 07, 2020
2020-08-03LegislaturePresented to Governor on August 03, 2020
2020-08-03LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2020-08-03LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 47-0-2
2020-07-31LegislatureVargas name added
2020-07-23LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2020-07-20LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-07-20LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER207 adopted
2020-03-23LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER207 filed
2020-03-23LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER207
2020-03-09LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-02-25LegislatureSpeaker priority bill
2020-02-18LegislaturePlaced on General File
2020-02-04LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 11, 2020
2020-01-24LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2020-01-21LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback