NE LB1080 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Approved by Governor on April 07, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Approved by Governor on April 07, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to direct purchases and use of recyclable material by correctional industries
Title
Change provisions relating to direct purchases and use of recyclable material by correctional industries
Sponsors
Sen. Les Seiler [N] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 07, 2016 |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 01, 2016 |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-03-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER204 adopted |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER204 filed |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER204 |
2016-03-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2016 |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |