NE LB1080 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for nonprofit nursery stock distributors under the Plant Protection and Plant Pest Act
Title
Provide for nonprofit nursery stock distributors under the Plant Protection and Plant Pest Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2014 |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=22237 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1080.pdf |