NE LB1079 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1079 amended into LB1008 by AM2737
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriate funds to the Nebraska State Patrol

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriate funds to the Nebraska State Patrol

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-18LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB1079 amended into LB1008 by AM2737
2020-08-13LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2020-01-28LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 06, 2020
2020-01-24LegislatureReferred to Appropriations Committee
2020-01-21LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback