NE LB1078 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1073 amended into LB1078 by AM2318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1073 amended into LB1078 by AM2318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change sibling placement and other foster care requirements, change sibling visitation, require reporting of sexual abuse, and eliminate certain obsolete provisions
Title
Change sibling placement and other foster care requirements, change sibling visitation, require reporting of sexual abuse, and eliminate certain obsolete provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1073 amended into LB1078 by AM2318 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB411 amended into LB1078 by AM2434 |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST47 |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Bolz AM2434 adopted |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Bolz AM2434 filed |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Crawford AM2318 adopted |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Crawford AM2318 filed |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO232 withdrawn |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO232 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Executive Board priority bill |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2018 |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |