NE LB1065A | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Murante FA164 adopted |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Murante FA164 filed |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER178 adopted |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER178 filed |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER178 |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Murante FA143 adopted |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Murante FA143 filed |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |