NE LB1064 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB322 amended into LB1064 by AM3161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to the sale and use of tobacco products

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to the sale and use of tobacco products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Legislature - Briese AM3228 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Legislature - Crawford AM3161 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Briese AM3062 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-18LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB322 amended into LB1064 by AM3161
2020-08-18LegislatureApproved by Governor on August 15, 2020
2020-08-12LegislaturePresented to Governor on August 11, 2020
2020-08-11LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2020-08-11LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1
2020-08-04LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST71
2020-08-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-08-03LegislatureBriese AM3228 adopted
2020-08-03LegislatureCrawford AM3161 adopted
2020-08-03LegislatureLinehan AM3175 withdrawn
2020-07-30LegislatureBriese AM3228 filed
2020-07-27LegislatureCrawford AM3161 filed
2020-07-27LegislatureLinehan AM3175 filed
2020-07-27LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2020-07-21LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-07-21LegislatureBriese AM3062 adopted
2020-07-21LegislatureBriese AM3062 filed
2020-03-10LegislaturePlaced on General File
2020-02-20LegislatureGeneral Affairs priority bill
2020-01-27LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 03, 2020
2020-01-24LegislatureReferred to General Affairs Committee
2020-01-21LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback