NE LB1060 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide an exemption from newborn screening
Title
Provide an exemption from newborn screening
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2024 |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Halloran name added |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |