NE LB106 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Enrollment and Review ER5 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change fees relating to access to drivers' records and provide for a new motor vehicle operator's license services system

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change fees relating to access to drivers' records and provide for a new motor vehicle operator's license services system

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER5 filed
2021-02-24LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER5
2021-02-16LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2021-02-02LegislaturePlaced on General File
2021-01-15LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 25, 2021
2021-01-11LegislatureReferred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
2021-01-07LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback